Loskot et al v. El Cerrito Galleria et al
Plaintiff: Marshall Loskot and Yvonne Williams
Defendant: El Cerrito Galleria, Carolyn Gan, Deanna Michelle Gan, Kristin A. Gan, Teresa Gan Havton, Sandra Colleen Gan, Inder P. Pahwa and Satinder K. Pahwa
Case Number: 4:2012cv05549
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to file a Status Report by 10/7/2015. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/10/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leonard H. Watkins terminated (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Service by Publication. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER vacating December 5, 2013 hearing on 13 MOTION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by Yvonne Williams, Marshall Loskot. The matter will be decided without oral argument pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b). Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/26/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/18/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loskot et al v. El Cerrito Galleria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Loskot
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Williams
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Cerrito Galleria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Gan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Michelle Gan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin A. Gan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Gan Havton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Colleen Gan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inder P. Pahwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satinder K. Pahwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?