Myles v. AlliedBarton Security Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joan Myles
Defendant: Allied Security Holdings, LLC, Spectaguard Acquisition, LLC and AlliedBarton Security Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv05761
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Hon. James Donato denying 77 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING 54 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/12/2014. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation TO TAKE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR filed by AlliedBarton Security Services LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/9/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Dispositive motions to be heard by 6/4/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2014 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/11/2014 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ON 33 STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The cross motions for summary judgment/adjudication shall be filed in sufficient time to be heard no later than 1/29/2014. Mediation shall also be completed by 1/29/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/03/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myles v. AlliedBarton Security Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Security Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectaguard Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedBarton Security Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Myles
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?