J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Beyene
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Tesfaye Beyene
Case Number: 4:2012cv05782
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO STAY ACTION IN LIGHT OF DEFENDANT'S PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER BANKRUPTCY ACT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 24, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT COPY OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. The parties are directed to submit, no later than October 18, 2013, a copy of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING REMAINING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND DATES AND TRIAL DATE; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. All remaining pretrial deadlines and dates and the trial date are vacated. The parties are directed to file on September 27, 2013 a Joint Status Report to apprise the Court on the status of the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 21, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/25/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER DIRECTING ALL COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 20, 2013 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE ANSWER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Beyene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesfaye Beyene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?