J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Lopez
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Aldo Lopez
Case Number: 4:2012cv05784
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1934
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING PLAINTIFFS 42 MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/15/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG striking 26 Motion for Default Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for brief from Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 1, 2013. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 10 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?