RTJ, Inc. v. SCIenergy, Inc.
Plaintiff: RTJ, Inc.
Defendant: SCIenergy, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05838
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/22/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 Status Report filed by RTJ, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/12/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE in relation to 24 Notice of Settlement filed by RTJ, Inc.: Further Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 6/12/2013 01:30 P.M. VACATED. Parties shall file a Status Report by no later than 7/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/3/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Non-expert Discovery and Expert Disclosure due by 6/11/2013. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 6/25/2013. Expert Discovery to be completed by 7/9/2013. Last day to hear dispositive motions on 8/8/2013 11:00 AM. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement/Trial Briefs due by 9/27/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2013 03:00 PM and Jury Trial (estimated for 2 days) set for 10/28/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/14/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RTJ, Inc. v. SCIenergy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCIenergy, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Bodzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RTJ, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Michael Standard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?