Golloher et al v. Todd Christopher International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marisa Freeman, Roberta Chase, Michael Shapiro, Andrea Golloher and Brenda Brown
Defendant: Todd Christopher International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv06002
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR POSTING OF APPEAL BOND AND DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/7/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES, AND AWARDING CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARDSAS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL SETTLEMENT. Final Approval Hearing set for 4/3/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, PROVIDING FOR NOTICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/31/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO RESET CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF PENDING MEDIATION. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/31/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 8/18/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 8/18/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 6 Stipulation (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golloher et al v. Todd Christopher International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Freeman
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Lisa Margaret Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Chase
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Lisa Margaret Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shapiro
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Lisa Margaret Burger
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Golloher
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Lisa Margaret Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Brown
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Lisa Margaret Burger
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Christopher International, Inc.
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Jay Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?