Maples v. Solarwinds, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mike Maples, Jr.
Defendant: Solarwinds, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv06066
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/17/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cousins for Settlement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/24/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Motions due by 12/9/2014; Responses due by 12/16/2014; Replies due by 12/23/2014; Final Pretrial Conference/ Motion in Limine set for 1/12/2015 01:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (3-4 day) set for 1/21/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/13/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 57 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 STIPULATION Continuing Pretrial Dates. Motions due by 8/5/2014; Responses due by 8/13/2015; Replies due by 8/19/2015. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/26/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ORDER signed on 6/20/2014 by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 43 MOTION FORSUMMARY JUDGMENT. (denying as moot 62 Motion for Leave to File). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SOLARWINDS, INC.S 78 MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO CONTINUE THE PRE-TRIAL, CONFERENCE, TRIAL AND RELATED DATES. Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/15/2014; Responses due by 7/22/2014; Replies due by 7/29/2014; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2014 01:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (3 day) set for 9/22/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/9/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Denying as moot 73 Motion. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference set for 5/30/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/29/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 51 MOTION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (terminating 47 Motion to Continue) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 40 Motion to Continue (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 37 Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Arnstrong on 10/21/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin F. Foster (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference previously set on 6/28/2013 11:00 AM continued to 7/15/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Settlement Conference for July 15, 2013 filed by Solarwinds, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/1/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY THE AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO EXTEND THE COMPLETION DATE FOR A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Solarwinds, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/29/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maples v. Solarwinds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Maples, Jr.
Represented By: Demetrios Anaipakos
Represented By: Tania Beth Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solarwinds, Inc.
Represented By: Gloria C. Franke
Represented By: Zia Modabber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?