The Board of Trustees v. Ontiveros Concrete Inc
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Defendant: Ontiveros Concrete Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv06338
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING; DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/1/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING; CONTINUING STAY. Compliance Hearing set 3/14/2014 is VACATED and a Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 9/26/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/11/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION FOR CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference scheduled for March 25, 2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/21/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees v. Ontiveros Concrete Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ontiveros Concrete Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?