In re Gilda Alvarado

Appellant: Albert M. Kun and Gilda Alvarado
Miscellaneous: Dennis Montali and U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. District of CA (San Francisco)
Trustee: Janina M. Hoskins and Office of the Trustee / SF
Case Number: 4:2012cv06478
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 5 Motion to Stay.(hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
April 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING APPEALS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING ORDERS OF THE BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/7/2013. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Gilda Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Albert M. Kun
Represented By: Albert Miklos Kun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gilda Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Dennis Montali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. District of CA (San Francisco)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Janina M. Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the Trustee / SF
Represented By: Vikas Kumar
Represented By: Kumar Vikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.