Hunter v. American Airlines et al

Defendant: Eulen America, Inc. and American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracey Hunter
Case Number: 4:2013cv00290
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/4/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 25 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
November 27, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/27/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. American Airlines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eulen America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Hunter
Represented By: Carlos Jato
Represented By: Taghi Astanehe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.