Alcaraz et al v. Napolitano et al
Plaintiff: E.V.A., C.A., S.A., Bernave Alcaraz and Maria Victoria Alcaraz
Defendant: John Kerry, John Morton, Timothy S. Aitken, Janet Napolitano, Alan Bersin and Eric Holder
Case Number: 4:2013cv00511
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is continued from September 19, 2014 to November 21, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than November 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF PENDING ACTION BY MINORS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: STIPULATION; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The Court defers ruling on the parties' Stipulation to Expand Time for ADR until after the April 4, 2014 Status Conference, at which the parties shall be prepared to discuss all future dates set by the Court's Pretrial Preparation Order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART UNITED STATES' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. As to the First, Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth Claims for Relief, the motion is granted. As to the Se cond and Third Claims for Relief, the motion is granted to the extent such claims are based on fingerprinting, and denied to the extent such claims are based on tightening of handcuffs and manner of driving. As to the Fourth Claim for Relief, the mot ion is granted to the extent such claim is based on the mailing error and failure to ascertain if the removal order was stayed, and denied to the extent such claim is based on the lack of seatbelts and manner of driving. To the extent the motion seek s dismissal of Does 1-100 from the First, Second, Third, Fourth, Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth Claims for Relief, the motion is granted. The Court will afford plaintiffs leave to file a Second Amended Complaint for the limited purpose of amending the Se cond and Third Claims for Relief to the extent said claims are based on the manner in which Maria was fingerprinted. Any Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than September 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Bernave Alcaraz is appointed as guardian ad litem for the minor plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 24, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/28/2013. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE MAY 24, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER. Alcaraz v Napolitano, 11-3716 MMC, is related to Alcaraz v. Napolitano, 13-511 SBA. All future filings are to bear the initials MMC immediately after the case number. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 18, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Alan Bersin, Timothy S. Aitken, John Morton, Eric Holder, John Kerry, Janet Napolitano. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/12/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, Stipulation re Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Alan Bersin, Timothy S. Aitken, John Morton, Eric Holder, John Kerry, Janet Napolitano. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/9/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcaraz et al v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kerry
Represented By: Lana Vahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morton
Represented By: Lana Vahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Aitken
Represented By: Lana Vahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Lana Vahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Bersin
Represented By: Lana Vahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Represented By: Lana Vahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.V.A.
Represented By: H. Nelson Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.
Represented By: H. Nelson Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A.
Represented By: H. Nelson Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernave Alcaraz
Represented By: H. Nelson Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Victoria Alcaraz
Represented By: H. Nelson Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?