Taganas v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: Raul G. Taganas
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 4:2013cv00547
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Trial date and schedule set. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/21/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
January 21, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Trial and some Related Dates. Bench Trial set for 9/8/2014 09:30 AM before Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
August 4, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/04/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taganas v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul G. Taganas
Represented By: Lyle C. Cavin, Jr.
Represented By: Ralph J. Mellusi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.