Century Surety Company v. Acer Hotel et al
Plaintiff: Century Surety Company
Defendant: Acer Hotel, Benzir Shaikh, Anwar Shaikh, Handlery Hotels, Inc., Terry White and Joseph J. Ferreira
Case Number: 4:2013cv00593
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER by Hon. William Alsup granting 59 (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WRIT OF EXECUTION issued (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting 53 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Hugh Douglas Galt terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STIPULATION. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2014.Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/3/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 24 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO ATTEND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 22 Motion to Appear by Telephone].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century Surety Company v. Acer Hotel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century Surety Company
Represented By: Hugh Douglas Galt
Represented By: John Edward Peer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benzir Shaikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anwar Shaikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handlery Hotels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry White
Represented By: Frank Z. Leidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Ferreira
Represented By: Frank Z. Leidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?