Lothlen v. Wachovia Mortgage, FSB et al
Plaintiff: Aline Lothlen
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., World Savings Bank, FSB, Cal-Western Reconveyance and Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Case Number: 4:2013cv00922
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JUNE 27, 2014 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 41 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 29 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, Motions terminated: 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 26 Clerks Notice, (Joint) to Extend Time to Continue the October 18, 2013 Case Management Conference and to Respond to the Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/13 is continued to 11/22/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/13 is continued to 10/18/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/16/13., Motions terminated: 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/13 is continued to 8/23/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/13., Motions terminated: 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CMC filed by Aline Lothlen (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/13 is continued to 8/23/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/13., Motions terminated: 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CMC filed by Aline Lothlen. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lothlen v. Wachovia Mortgage, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aline Lothlen
Represented By: James Harvey Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?