Balzarini v. Ulit et al

Defendant: W. Ulit, Agtarap, Martin Hoshino, Jennifer Schwartz, Kyle Lewis, Jeffrey Wang and Wayne Ulit
Plaintiff: St. Michael Doc Balzarini
Case Number: 4:2013cv01486
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
October 2, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTION 52 MOTION Re-Hearing and Notice of Motion and Motion Appealing Final Judgment: 28 USC Section 1291 filed by St. Michael Dennis Balzarini. Motion Terminated.. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/02/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
November 5, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/05/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
May 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Complaint due by 6/5/2013. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
September 5, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. 2nd Amended Complaint due by 10/9/2013. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/5/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balzarini v. Ulit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Ulit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agtarap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hoshino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Ulit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Michael Doc Balzarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.