United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 2441 Mission Street, San Francisco, California
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements Located at 2441 Mission Street, San Francisco, California
Claimant: Shambala Healing Center
Case Number: 4:2013cv02062
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RE: SHAMBHALA HEALING CENTER, INC.'S 12(B)(1) MOTION TO DISMISS; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; STATUS OF LIS PENDENS - SIGNED (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE: LIS PENDENS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER, Motions terminated: 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Shambala Healing Center. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/8/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER LIFTING STAY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED ORDER OF JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO THE OWNERSHIP INTEREST OF THE DEFENDANT REAL PROPERTY 79 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING CLAIMANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER CERTIFYING AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) AND STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF APPEAL 62 69 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING CLAIMANT SHAMBALA AND NON-PARTY SHAWA'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A STAY 51 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH 46 50 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/9/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING CLAIMANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER : Status Conference set for 8/7/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 2441 Mission Street, San Francisco, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arvon Jacque Perteet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements Located at 2441 Mission Street, San Francisco, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shambala Healing Center
Represented By: Henry George Wykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?