Arczar LLC v. Nintendo of America Inc.
Plaintiff: Geovector Corporation and Arczar LLC
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv02672
Filed: June 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/12/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER adopting the schedule proposed by 57 STIPULATION. Markman hearing set for 6/13/2014 09:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/09/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Move Scheduling Conference. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/05/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William H. Orrick granting 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice by Hao Ni. Signed on 08/0/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arczar LLC v. Nintendo of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geovector Corporation
Represented By: Kris S LeFan
Represented By: Neal Gopal Massand
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arczar LLC
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Neal Gopal Massand
Represented By: Kris S LeFan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc.
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Jerry A. Riedinger
Represented By: Tyler C Peterson
Represented By: Antoine M McNamara
Represented By: Timothy J. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?