Thomas v. Del Biaggio, III et al
Plaintiff: Robert J. Thomas
Defendant: William James Del Biaggio, III, R. Todd Neilson and Thomvest Holdings LLC
3rd_party_defendant: Sand Hill Capital Holdings Inc
3rd_party_plaintiff: Thomvest Holdings LLC, CA
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Francisco and Thomas E. Carlson
Case Number: 4:2013cv02794
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157 (c)(1) Findings, Concl. & Proposed Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATED ORDER FOR DISPOSTION OF INTEPLEADED FUNDS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/20/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING REGARDING THOMVEST'S MOTION RE: BILL OF COSTS. Compliance Hearing regarding non-movants' position on Thomvest's Motion is set for Friday, 1/9/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/16/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A STAY PENDING APPEAL TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Judgment and for Alternate Security. Respon ses due by 9/24/2014. Replies due by 9/26/2014. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/17/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CORRECT FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/16/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ACCEPTING BANKRUPTCY COURT'S AMENDED PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/11/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Del Biaggio, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Thomas
Represented By: Michael Haldon Himes
Represented By: Charles Christian Sipos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William James Del Biaggio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Todd Neilson
Represented By: John D. Fiero
Represented By: Miriam Khatiblou
Represented By: Maxim B. Litvak
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomvest Holdings LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Johanna Calabria
Represented By: Dara Levinson
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Sand Hill Capital Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Thomvest Holdings LLC, CA
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Johanna Calabria
Represented By: Dara Levinson
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?