American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Defendant: Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2013cv03127
Filed: July 8, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 70 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: Motions for Summary Judgment 35 , 36 and CRM-Lye-17543-17544; ORDER re: Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/13/15. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re: In Camera Review Document Sampling 51 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/30/15. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re: In Camera Review of Documents. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/2/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER rescheduling hearing re: cross-motions for summary judgment 35 & 36 for 3/5/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James; Joint Statement and related documents due by 2/17/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/3/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/17/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 Stipulation filed by Department of Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/29/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/9/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Lynn Yuhee Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?