Molica v. Medeiros
Plaintiff: Cody Molica
Defendant: Joshua Medeiros
Case Number: 4:2013cv03185
Filed: July 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting request to appear by phone. Counsel shall be on standby between 3:00 and 5 p.m. waiting for the Court's call. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/18/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER, Motions terminated: 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 44 Clerks Notice, RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Joshua Medeiros. Status Conference set for 6/27/2014 03:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/29/14. All parties may appear by phone. Counsel shall email the Clerk with the direct dial phone numbers to be used. The Court initiates all conference calls. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY # 8 .
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing .(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molica v. Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Molica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?