Narog v. City of Redwood City et al
Plaintiff: Cory Narog
Defendant: City of Redwood City, Figueroa, Faljean and Gary
Case Number: 4:2013cv03237
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/13/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 5/15/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/08/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/07/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 113 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 104 Motion to Continue.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Re 96 Letter filed by Cory Narog. Settlement Conference reset to 2/6/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/22/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXCUSE OFFICER ATTENDANCE: Re 94 Letter filed by Jean Paul Gary, City of Redwood City, Kenneth Faljean, Ashley Osborne, Victor Figueroa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/3/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2015)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Continuing Trial and Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/11/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER APPROVING - Re: 84 Letter filed by Cory Narog. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/4/2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting as modified 77 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 52 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER VACATING JUNE 26, 2014 HEARING ON MOTION 52 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/04/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 49 Discovery Letter Brief. Plaintiff may take a one-hour deposition of Collins at Collins' office on Topics 1, 3 and 5.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 33 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 53 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. The court is in receipt of the parties' joint letter addressing their discovery disputes, filed on April 10, 2014. [43.] Because the joint letter is not properly categorized on the docket as a motion, the parties are hereby ordered to refile the joint letter on the court's ECF system as a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/18/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOR REDWOOD CITY TO BRING DOCUMENTS TO HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/09/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
March 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 33 . Redwood City shall lodge the following documents for in camera review by April 3, 2014: RC 459, 564, 565-568, 672, 673-92. In addition, if Redwood City continues to assert the official information privilege, it must file a declaration or affidavit by April 3, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/29/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 21 and 27 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/25/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 30 Stipulation. The hearing on Joint Discovery Letters 21 and 27 shall be continued to March 13, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. at the U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO LODGE DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/07/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO LODGE DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/27/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narog v. City of Redwood City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Narog
Represented By: Jivaka Candappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Redwood City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faljean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?