Tripp et al v. Crossmark, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clay Tripp and Karen Solberg
Defendant: Crossmark, Inc. and Chi Management Group, LP
Case Number: 4:2013cv03480
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RESET FINAL APPROVAL HEARING granting 49 STIPULATION. Fairness Hearing set for 6/17/2015 02:00 PM.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/23/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 41 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 33 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 8/19/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2014. (CMC set for 7/17/2014 VACATED.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/09/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING MEDIATION AND POSSIBLE CONSOLIDATION BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION re 30 STIPULATION. All dates related to the class certification motion and the pretrial and trial schedule set forth in the Amended Civil Pretrial Order (Docket No. 28) are vacated. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/11/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/01/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND by Judge William H. Orrick denying 15 Motion to Remand. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripp et al v. Crossmark, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clay Tripp
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Solberg
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossmark, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Blecha Hall
Represented By: Robert Allen Jones
Represented By: Timothy L. Reed
Represented By: Erica Kristen Rocush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Management Group, LP
Represented By: Carolyn Blecha Hall
Represented By: Robert Allen Jones
Represented By: Timothy L. Reed
Represented By: Erica Kristen Rocush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?