Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Yelp, Inc.
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: Yelp Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03587
Filed: August 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting (188) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:13-cv-04513-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015).
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER 190 Advancing Hearing Date and Continuing Briefing Schedule Re: Defendants' Section 101 Motions to Dismiss and/or for Judgment on the Pleadings. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 188 in 5:13-cv-04513-RMW) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Opposition due by 6/26/2015. Reply due by 7/14/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/1/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER CONFIRMING STAY. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/17/2014. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Conditionally Granting 162 Motion to Stay by Judge Ronald M. Whyte in case 5:13-cv-04513-RMW; granting (127) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-04206-RMW (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER to show cause re consolidation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 91 Motion to Stay - REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION OF SEALED DOCUMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/18/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RESETTING TIME FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY 91 . Defendant is advised that the hearing on the motion was improperly noticed for December 18, 2013 at 1:30 p.m., a date and time that is not one of the court's regularly schedu led civil law and motion hearing dates. However, in light of the court's trial schedule, the hearing on the motion will proceed on December 18, 2013 at 2:30 p.m (not 1:30 p.m., as originally noticed). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/12/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 78 Motion to Relate Case.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER TO RE-FILE REQUEST FOR ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF CHARLES AINSWORTH. Plaintiff is ordered to re-file its request for an order permitting withdrawal of Charles Ainsworth as counsel for Plaintiff and indicate whether it has met the requirements of Civil Local Rule 11-5(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/25/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Yelp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Represented By: Anne Marie Rogaski
Represented By: Robert Davis Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?