King.com Limited v. 6 Waves LLC
Plaintiff: King.com Limited
Defendant: 6 Waves LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv03977
Filed: August 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING KING.COM LIMITED'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL The parties' Confidential Settlement Agreement shall remain filed under seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES The parties are directed to submit, no later than October 1, 2014, a copy of the settlement agreement, or, in the alternative, a stipulation and proposed order that do not provide the Court will retain jurisdiction over the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 18, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 88 Discovery Letter Brief and 90 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 88 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/19/14. The August 28, 2014 hearing on the joint discovery letter will be held as scheduled. However, the parties are directed to continue meeting and conferring about the issues raised in the letter. By August 22, 2014, the parties shall re-file the joint discovery letter to update the court of the status of the parties' disputes and whether they have resolved those disputes without judicial intervent ion. Lead counsel for both parties must appear on August 28, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. to meet and confer in person in the courtroom prior to the hearing regarding any outstanding discovery disputes raised in the updated letter. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 84 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' FIRST, FOURTH AND SIXTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; AFFORDING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER VACATING JULY 11, 2014 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu DENYING MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF 76 ; NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. The parties are ordered to comply with the procedure ordered by Judge Chesney 78 and to file a joint letter by no later than June 25, 2014. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/28/14. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 64 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 11, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; AFFORDING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for March 21, 2014, is hereby continued to April 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. The Case Management Conference is continued to March 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 17, 2014 HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING KING.COM LIMITED'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. The documents described shall remain filed under seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 20, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' FORUM NON CONVENIENS MOTION, MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Opposition due December 6, 2013; reply due January 3, 2014; Case Management Conference re-set for February 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King.com Limited v. 6 Waves LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King.com Limited
Represented By: Clifford Charles Webb
Represented By: Jennifer Lloyd Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Waves LLC
Represented By: Sonali Deeksha Maitra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?