Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Twitter, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: Twitter Inc. and Dataminr, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv04207
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2013 Filing 83 CLERKS NOTICE to Counsel That Case Has Been Transferred to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of California. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 82 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2013 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order - KAW)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 81 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:12-cv-00792. Case file electronically transferred, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 9/13/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/16/2013 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California - no longer held for 20 days per Judge due to notice of non opposition filed. (sm, )
August 30, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC re 79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Evolutionary Intelligence's Notice of Non-Opposition to Magistrate's Report & Recommendation (McCrary, Marie)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/27/13. (bas, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 67 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 08/21/13. (mll, )
August 19, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Twitter, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Tadlock, Robert)
August 19, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 2, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Todd M Kennedy on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Kennedy, Todd)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/28/13. (bas, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/28/13. (bas, )
June 27, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ESI ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order - ESI Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order - Protective Order, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Reuben Chen, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chen, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chen, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Chen, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Chen)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 27, 2013 Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and ESI Order by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 21, 2013 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 62 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Defendants' Opposition to Evolutionary Intelligence's Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Magistrate's Order Denying Leave to File Amended Complaints filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File protective orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/17/2013. (sm, )
June 12, 2013 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
June 11, 2013 Filing 67 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 62 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER:Markman Hearing set for 4/22/2013 10:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2013. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (lfs, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/29/13. (bas, )
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/28/13. (bas, )
May 28, 2013 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
May 28, 2013 Filing 60 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Kennedy, Todd)
May 23, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC of Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Ainsworth, Charles)
May 22, 2013 Filing 58 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Safier, Seth)
May 17, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marie Ann McCrary on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (McCrary, Marie)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/16/13. (bas, )
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/16/13. (bas, )
May 15, 2013 Filing 54 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 53 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Tadlock, Robert)
May 15, 2013 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Tadlock, Robert)
May 15, 2013 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
May 15, 2013 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL EX. 2 TO DECLARATION OF ROBERT D. TADLOCK ISO REPLY RE MOTION TO TRANSFER by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
May 14, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Patek, Anthony)
May 13, 2013 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Twitter, Inc. (Tadlock, Robert)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) Replies due by 5/15/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/3/2013. (sm, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
May 2, 2013 Filing 46 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Tadlock, Robert)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER regarding issues to be discussed at scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/13. (bas, )
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2013 10:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/2013. (sm, )
April 26, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Kennedy, Todd)
April 26, 2013 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Seth Safier, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/23/13. (bas, )
April 22, 2013 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
April 22, 2013 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Kennedy, Todd)
April 12, 2013 Filing 38 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of service): 37 Response to Motion,.. (Tadlock, Robert) Modified on 4/12/2013 (sm, ).
April 11, 2013 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Tadlock Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
March 25, 2013 Filing 36 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #62 DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE***AMENDED COMPLAINT against Twitter, Inc., Crimson Hexagon, Inc., Dataminr, Inc., Mass Relevance, Inc., filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Kennedy, Todd) Modified on 9/10/2013 (sm, ).
March 25, 2013 Filing 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Stay; granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) ( Responses due by 4/29/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/27/2013. (sm, )
February 22, 2013 Filing 33 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 24 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a)Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Tadlock, Robert)
February 15, 2013 Filing 32 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY. DISREGARD.*** REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF TWITTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Tadlock, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2013 (gsg).
February 14, 2013 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Support re 22 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF TWITTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Tadlock, Robert)
February 14, 2013 Filing 30 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 31 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** RESPONSE in Support re 22 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF TWITTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Tadlock, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2013 (gsg).
February 12, 2013 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a)Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit A)(Kennedy, Todd)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/06/13. cc:attys 2-07-13(mll, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a)Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Tadlock Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Tadlock Declaration)(Tadlock, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2013: # 3 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
February 4, 2013 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF TWITTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
February 1, 2013 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Tadlock, Robert)
January 22, 2013 Filing 24 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
January 22, 2013 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
January 17, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF TWITTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Tadlock Decl. ISO Twitter's Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit A to Tadlock Decl., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
January 15, 2013 Filing 21 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (tlh, )
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a); Responses due by 1/21/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/13. cc:attys 1-10-13 (mll, )
January 9, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Rogaski on behalf of Twitter, Inc. (Rogaski, Anne)
January 7, 2013 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
January 4, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd M Kennedy on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Kennedy, Todd)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6); Responses due by 1/21/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/13. cc:attys 1-04-13 (mll, )
January 2, 2013 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 21, 2012 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Twitter, Inc. (Tadlock, Robert)
December 21, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Axelsen Decl. ISO Motion to Transfer, # 2 Affidavit Connor Decl. ISO Motion to Transfer, # 3 Exhibit Exs. A-T to Connor Decl., # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
December 20, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC NOTICE CASE IS READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 17, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Jude Patek on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Patek, Anthony)
December 13, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Conner Decl. ISO Twitter's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Robert)
December 10, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Safier on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Safier, Seth)
November 19, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 7 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Twitter, Inc. to 12/13/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Davis Tadlock on behalf of Twitter, Inc. (Tadlock, Robert)
November 13, 2012 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Twitter, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 2, 2012 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Twitter, Inc. on 10/23/2012, by personal service; answer due: 11/13/2012. (mll, )
October 24, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
October 18, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Twitter, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
October 17, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
October 17, 2012 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 17, 2012 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 17, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3833988.), filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A '536 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B '682 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Anne Marie Rogaski
Represented By: Robert D Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dataminr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?