Heatherly et al v. Sonoma County Fair and Exposition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daren Heatherly, Irma Ramirez and Harrison Benson Kinney Jr.
Defendant: Sonoma County Fair and Exposition, Inc. and County of Sonoma
Case Number: 4:2013cv04327
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Sonoma County Fair and Exposition, Inc., Irma Ramirez, County of Sonoma, Harrison Benson Kinney Jr., Daren Heatherly, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/12/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to file dismissal within 60 days per 15 Certification of Mediation Session filed by JoAnne Dellaverson. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/1/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING re 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO CONDUCT THE JOINT SITE INSPECTION; and [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON filed by Sonoma County Fair and Exposition, Inc., Irma Ramirez, County of Sonoma, Harrison Benson Kinney Jr., Daren Heatherly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/5/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Sonoma County Fair and Exposition, Inc. Attorney Eugene Elliot is added as counsel of record for Sonoma Co. Fair & Exposition, Inc. Attorney Anne L. Keck terminated. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/17/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/27/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heatherly et al v. Sonoma County Fair and Exposition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daren Heatherly
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Represented By: George Salah Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Represented By: George Salah Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Benson Kinney Jr.
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Represented By: George Salah Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Fair and Exposition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?