Polk, Jr. et al v. County of Alameda et al
Plaintiff: Jozette Lester and Louis Polk, Jr.
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahern, County of Alameda and Derek Pope
Case Number: 4:2013cv04790
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal filed by Jozette Lester, Derek Pope, County of Alameda, Louis Polk, Jr., Gregory J. Ahern, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/21/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/08/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION DEADLINE. See 21 Case Management Statement filed by Louis Polk, Jr., 20 Case Management Statement filed by Derek Pope, County of Alameda, Gregory J. Ahern. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on March 14, 2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk, Jr. et al v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozette Lester
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Gayla B. Libet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Polk, Jr.
Represented By: Gayla B. Libet
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?