Brown v. Family Radio Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lizzie E. Brown
Defendant: Tom Evans, Harold Camping and Family Radio Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv05305
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 53 Motion to Strike (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 50 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 30 Motion to Dismiss. (Filed on 5/30/2014)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Family Radio Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Lucia
Represented By: Bruce Michael Timm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Camping
Represented By: Bruce Michael Timm
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Lucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Radio Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Michael Timm
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Lucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizzie E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?