McNEIL et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: TROY L. McNEIL and TRICIA A. McNEIL
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Cal-Western Reconveyance, LLC and U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OT WACHOVIA BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION, MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SE
Case Number: 4:2013cv05519
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal without prejudice filed by Tricia A. McNeil, Troy L. McNeil. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 17, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. Discovery due 12/11/2015. Last hearing date for dispositive motions 1/21/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 2/29/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Discovery due by 12/11/2015. Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/29/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti for an estimated 3-5 days. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/20/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 31 . ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/25/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/16/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/11/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNEIL et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY L. McNEIL
Represented By: Nathan Mubasher
Represented By: Gary Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRICIA A. McNEIL
Represented By: Nathan Mubasher
Represented By: Gary Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daska P Babcock
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OT WACHOVIA BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION, MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SE
Represented By: Daska P Babcock
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?