U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund et al v. Peninsula Air Conditioning, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.A. Local No. 467 Vacation Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Apprentice and Journeymen Training Trust Fund for San Mateo County, U.A. Local No. 467 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund and Mike Swanson
Defendant: Peninsula Air Conditioning, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv05522
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE 12 MOTION for Default Judgment. Motion Hearing continued to 12/4/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/31/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISCHARGING 6 Order to Show Cause. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 11/4/2014 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 08/05/2014. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/25/2014. Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2014. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 9/2/2014 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/11/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund et al v. Peninsula Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. Local No. 467 Vacation Trust Fund
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Apprentice and Journeymen Training Trust Fund for San Mateo County
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. Local No. 467 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. Local No. 467 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Swanson
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peninsula Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?