Weiland v. City of Concord et al
Plaintiff: Walther Weiland
Defendant: Chief of Police Guy Swanger, City of Concord and Kevin Mansourian
Case Number: 4:2013cv05570
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Modified ORDER granting 43 Notice of Settlement and Request TO VACATE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES filed by Walther Weiland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/11/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE: PRIVILEGE LOG DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, granting 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 34 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: PRIVILEGE LOG DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on September 18, 2014. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF 23 . Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on August 7, 2014. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/26/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiland v. City of Concord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Guy Swanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Concord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mansourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walther Weiland
Represented By: Genevieve Kathryn Guertin
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?