J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2013cv05666
Filed: December 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, 9 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/5/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?