Savelson et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Wendy M. Adams, Dianna Lawrence, Edward Lawrence and Melvin Savelson
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corporation, Capital One Bank, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One F.S.B., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, J.P. Morgan Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC North American Holdings, Inc. and HSBC Holdings, PLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv05816
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MDL TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1720: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of New York. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 06/04/2014. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/27/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David S. Lesser (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 17 Stipulation as to Deadlines for Motion Practice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 18 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMITATIONS. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/25/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/30/2014 Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Abby F. Rudzin. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savelson et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corporation
Represented By: Michael Mugmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Represented By: Matthew David Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Matthew David Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One F.S.B.
Represented By: Matthew David Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey K Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey K Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Timothy Alan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Timothy Alan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Mugmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North American Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Mugmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings, PLC
Represented By: Michael Mugmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy M. Adams
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Lawrence
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Savelson
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?