Yang et al v. Boeing Company, The
Plaintiff: Jinhua Yang, Jingtao Xie and Jiaqi Xie
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Case Number: 4:2013cv05941
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPROVE MINOR'S COMPROMISE re (618 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR) MOTION for Approval of Minor's Compromise filed by Jingtao Xie, Jinhua Yang. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/6/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting re 47 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Boeing Company, The, Attorney Charles William Mulaney and Charles William Mulaney, III terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/26/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/27/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 5/30/2014 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/23/2014. Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, 5/6/2014 03:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/1/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang et al v. Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinhua Yang
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Represented By: Gabriel Shanti Barenfeld
Represented By: Justin T. Green
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: Brian LaCien
Represented By: Marc S. Moller
Represented By: Gretchen M. Nelson
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingtao Xie
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Represented By: Gabriel Shanti Barenfeld
Represented By: Justin T. Green
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: Brian LaCien
Represented By: Marc S. Moller
Represented By: Gretchen M. Nelson
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiaqi Xie
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Represented By: Gabriel Shanti Barenfeld
Represented By: Justin T. Green
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: Brian LaCien
Represented By: Marc S. Moller
Represented By: Gretchen M. Nelson
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Represented By: Bruce Duplan Campbell
Represented By: John David Dillow
Represented By: Bates McIntyre Larson
Represented By: Charles William Mulaney
Represented By: Charles William Mulaney, III
Represented By: Gretchen Marie Paine
Represented By: Michael E. Scoville
Represented By: Joe Silvernale
Represented By: Kaycie Lynn Wall
Represented By: Eric Brian Wolff
Represented By: Eric Brian Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?