April 14, 2016 |
Filing
160
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 148 Motion for Attorney Fees, costs, and class representative awards. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
|
November 20, 2015 |
Filing
141
ORDER setting hearing on the parties' 140 Joint MOTION for Hearing on Data Issues Re Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/20/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
135
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 124 , 134 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 2/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/28/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
133
ORDER requiring the parties to propose attorneys' fees motions deadline and other briefing deadlines, and hearing date for final approval re 132 Joint Supplemental Submission Regarding Notice to Class Members of Settlement and Claims Procedure. Response due by 9/25/2015. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/15/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
109
ORDER regarding Unusable Chambers Copies of Defendants' 93 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 107 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Declarations for Lack of Foundation and Inadmissible Hearsay, and accompanying exhibits and declarations. New chambers copies that comply with this order must be received by 3/31/2015. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/26/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
92
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE MARCH 31, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Sara Ewart, Chris Armenta, Ryan Tyson, T-Bird Nevada, LLC, Shannon Spalding, Ramon Perez, Tr ent Broadstreet, Alex Burroughs, Holly Gehl, Jamie Metter, T-Bird Restaurant Group, Inc., Brittni Zacher Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2015 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/24/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing
72
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Sara Ewart, OS Restaurant Services, LLC, Chris Armenta, Ryan Tyson, T-Bird Nevada, LLC, Shannon Spalding, Bloomin' Brands, Ramon Perez, Alex Burroughs, Trent Broadstreet, Holly Gehl, Jamie Metter, T-Bird Restaurant Group, Inc., OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC, Brittni Zacher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/7/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
71
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 53 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Shannon Spalding and for withdrawal of Shannon Spalding and Brittni Zacher as named plaintiffs. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
|
October 15, 2014 |
Filing
60
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting 58 Stipulation TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION AND ORDER 50 DISMISSING DEFENDANTS BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC., OSI RESTAURANT PARTNERS, LLC AND OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/23/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
47
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Re Notice Procedure Regarding Disclosure of Putative Class Members' Contact Information; [Proposed] Order filed by Sara Ewart, Chris Armenta, Ryan Tyson, T-Bird Nevada, LLC, Shannon Spalding, Ramon Perez, Trent Broadstreet, Alex Burroughs, Holly Gehl, Jamie Metter, T-Bird Restaurant Group, Inc., Brittni Zacher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/25/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
|
August 6, 2014 |
Filing
44
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 37 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
14
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Chris Armenta, Trent Broadstreet, Holly Gehl filed by OS Restaurant Services, LLC, Chris Armenta, T-Bird Nevada, LLC, Bloomin' Brands, Trent Broadstreet, Holly Gehl, T-Bird Restaurant Group, Inc., OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/4/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
|