Ripple Labs, Inc. v. LaCore Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ripple Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Rippln, Inc., LaCore Enterprises, LLC and Terry LaCore
Case Number: 4:2013cv05974
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/19/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/17/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/14/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ripple Labs, Inc. v. LaCore Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rippln, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaCore Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry LaCore
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ripple Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Matthew Malynn
Represented By: Jennifer Seraphine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?