Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Apotex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: L. Perrigo Company, Perrigo Israel Pharmaceutical Ltd., Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp. and Perrigo Company
Miscellaneous: Impax Laboratories, Inc.,
Case Number: 4:2013mc80026
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF SEALED COURT TRANSCRIPT OF 3/28/2013 HEARING re 36 Proposed Order filed by Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/3/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Proposed Order Re Impax's Request to Release Sealed Court Hearing Transcript filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/1/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/15/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 02/14/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Apotex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Perrigo Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Israel Pharmaceutical Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carl Gunnar Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Impax Laboratories, Inc.,
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Duff
Represented By: Gordon I. Endow
Represented By: William Andrew Rakoczy
Represented By: Alice Lynn Riechers
Represented By: Christine Jane Siwik
Represented By: Lyndy Chang Stewart
Represented By: Robert Michael Teigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?