Diaz Wholesale & Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Nong Shim Company, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: |
Diaz Wholesale & Manufacturing Co., Inc. |
Defendant: |
Sam Yang (U.S.A.), Inc., SamYang Foods Company, Ltd., Ottogi America, Inc., Ottogi Company, Ltd., Nongshim America, Inc., Nong Shim Company, Ltd, Paldo Company, Ltd. and Korea Yakult Co., Ltd. |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv00127 |
Filed: |
January 9, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Orrick |
Nature of Suit: |
Antitrust |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/23/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Filing
7
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Diaz Wholesale & Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Nong Shim Company, Ltd et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sam Yang (U.S.A.), Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: SamYang Foods Company, Ltd. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ottogi America, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ottogi Company, Ltd. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Nongshim America, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Nong Shim Company, Ltd |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Paldo Company, Ltd. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Korea Yakult Co., Ltd. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Diaz Wholesale & Manufacturing Co., Inc. |
Represented By: |
Renae Diane Steiner |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey Lawrence Spector |
Represented By: |
Eugene A. Spector |
Represented By: |
R Alexander Saveri |
Represented By: |
Guido Saveri |
Represented By: |
Douglas A. Millen |
Represented By: |
Travis Luke Manfredi |
Represented By: |
William Henry London |
Represented By: |
Steven A. Kanner |
Represented By: |
Jonathan M. Jagher |
Represented By: |
Vincent J. Esades |
Represented By: |
William G. Caldes |
Represented By: |
Cadio R. Zirpoli |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?