Allagas et al v. BP Solar International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Allagas, Arthur Ray and Brett Mohrman
Defendant: BP Solar International, Inc. and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv00560
Filed: February 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER RE: FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT ADDENDUM (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTATION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER TO FILE STATEMENT RE SETTLEMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Re: Status reports regarding settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/6/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTUNG 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Settlement filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., BP Solar International, Inc., MOTIONS WITHDRAWN 158 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Plaintiffs' Experts Regardin g Design Defect, Causation, and Failure Rate filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., BP Solar International, Inc., 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., BP Solar International, Inc., 148 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to FRCP 23 filed by Brett Mohrman, Michael Allagas, Arthur Ray.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/4/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEAL 154 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL 149 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 FURTHER ORDER Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 125 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER directing Defendant to produce its proposed random sample of 1,000 warranty claims to Plaintiffs by November 5, 2015 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER directing Defendant to either produce information or file a letter by October 22, 2015 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. If Plaintiffs oppose Defendants sampling proposal, they are ordered to file a response of no more than four pages outlining their objections, and a declaration explaining why Defendants proposal wil l not produce a statistically significant sample of warranty claims for proof of common defect if they dispute that contention. Any such opposition shall be filed no later than October 9, 2015. If Plaintiffs do not oppose Defendants proposal, the Parties are ordered to file a proposed order to that effect by October 13, 2015. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Compel; granting 113 Motion for Leave to File; granting 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Following Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 100 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER on Motion to Compel 56 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Lapote. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/15/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH LAPORTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE 37 37 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, Motions terminated: 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., BP Solar International, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/19/14 is continued to 6/27/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/8/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE 14 15 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, Motions terminated: 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 Clerks Notice, to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., BP Solar International, Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/14 is continued to 6/19/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/16/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allagas et al v. BP Solar International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Allagas
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Mindy Monhai Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ray
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Mindy Monhai Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Mohrman
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Mindy Monhai Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Solar International, Inc.
Represented By: Eskandar Alex Beroukhim
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Eskandar Alex Beroukhim
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?