Garcia v. Enterprise Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Garcia
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Lyft Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv00596
Filed: February 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 33 Motion to Dismiss (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 59 Discovery Letter Brief.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 42 Stipulation for Leave to File Instanter Enlarged Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Extend Time for Reply. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 31 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 28 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Enterprise Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: J. Daniel Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Huber
Represented By: Rachael Elizabeth Meny
Represented By: Michelle Sabrina Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Garcia
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Mark Stephen Eisen
Represented By: Chandler Randolph Givens
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Represented By: Jack D. Yamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?