Redmond v. San Mateo Police Department
Plaintiff: Walter Redmond
Defendant: San Mateo Police Department
Case Number: 4:2014cv00998
Filed: March 4, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 49 DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY 48 . ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions re 35 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/24/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ig, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/04/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 19 MOTION to Request Demand Raised to $2,500,000.00 filed by Walter Redmond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/04/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/4/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond v. San Mateo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Redmond
Represented By: Stanley Craig Goff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo Police Department
Represented By: David M. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?