Judelsohn v. Fitbit, Inc
Plaintiff: Robyn Judelsohn
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv01287
Filed: March 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (36 in case 4:14-cv-01287-CW and 27 in case 4:14-cv-01350-CW) Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Fitbit's Motion to Dismiss and to Continue the Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFING IN CONJUNCTION WITH FITBIT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on July 18, 2014. (cwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Joseph Fitapelli. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 11 Motion to Relate Case Case No. C 14-1350 JSC (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judelsohn v. Fitbit, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Judelsohn
Represented By: Joseph A Fitapelli
Represented By: Matthew Brian George
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Brian S Schaffer
Represented By: Linh G. Vuong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc
Represented By: Erin McCalmon Bosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?