The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Alvarez et al
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Isaias F. Alvarez doing business as Isamar Construction and Isamar Construction
Case Number: 4:2014cv01540
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE BANKRUPTCY STAY. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/22/15. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing By Defendant; Request for Stay of Action Pending Resolution of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy, filed by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California (Kramer, Jolene) (Filed on 1/21/2015) Modified on 1/22/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 Filing 27 Receipt from Weinberg Roger and Rosenfeld for Concepcion Lozano-Batista for payment of Court Ordered Sanctions in the amount of $250.00. Receipt No. 44611011874. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS as to Concepcion Lozano-Batista in the amount of $250. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White, on 9/22/14. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014) Modified on 9/23/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2014 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #18 Order to Show Cause, filed by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 8/5/2014) Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2014 Filing 24 Declaration of Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista in Support of #25 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 8/5/2014) Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2014 Filing 23 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #24 *** Declaration of Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista in Support of #25 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California . (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 8/5/2014) Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2014 Filing 22 Declaration of Jolene E. Kramer in Support of #21 Response to Consent/Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, filed by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Kramer, Jolene) (Filed on 7/29/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2014 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #17 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, filed by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Kramer, Jolene) (Filed on 7/29/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2014 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #19 Order. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2014. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Isaias F. Alvarez, Isamar Construction. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 16 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/11/2014 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 7/11/2014). Discovery due by 12/22/2014. Expert Witness List due by 1/21/2015. Bench Trial set for 6/1/2015 08:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 3, 2014 Filing 14 EX PARTE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by The Board of Trustees, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2014 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Isaias F. Alvarez. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California re #7 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, #6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,, #8 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California re #1 Complaint,,, (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Isaias F. Alvarez, Isamar Construction. Filed by The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 to First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-2 to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service of First Amended Complaint)(Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/9/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on April 8, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Isaias F. Alvarez, Isamar Construction. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2014 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs)(Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Damages, and Audit against Isaias F. Alvarez, Isamar Construction ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8503447.). Filed byThe Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 4/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Alvarez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Jolene Erin Kramer
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Jolene Erin Kramer
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Jolene Erin Kramer
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, in their Capacities as Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Jolene Erin Kramer
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaias F. Alvarez doing business as Isamar Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isamar Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?