Law v. Blandon et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Gilbert Law
Defendant: Blandon, Dep. Star #1430 and Sr. Dep. Star #1342
Case Number: 4:2014cv01943
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: PSLC GRC
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order 73 ORDER by Judge Nandor Vadas denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER by Judge Nandor Vadas denying 36 Motion for TRO. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order 34 ORDER OF SERVICE. Dispositive Motion due by 12/23/2014. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 10/24/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order 16 Certificate of Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 6/18/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/5/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law v. Blandon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gilbert Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep. Star #1430
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sr. Dep. Star #1342
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?