Liu et al v. Win Woo Trading, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kuang Xuan Liu and Pei Xiong Lin
Defendant: Win Woo Trading, LLC, Safety Trucking, LLC, Jia Jing Zheng, Jia Tun Zheng and Mindy Fang
Case Number: 4:2014cv02639
Filed: June 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Kandis Westmore Granting 215 Stipulation to Dismiss Action with Prejudice, and to Seal Documents Filed at Docket Numbers 147-3 and 148-4.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 203 Motion for Approval of Resolution of PAGA Claims. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 128 Motion for Sanctions Against Safety Trucking, Jia Thun Zheng, and counsel Leon Jew. Sanctions shall be paid within 30 days of this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Win Woo Defendants' 121 Motion for Summary Judgment against Kuang Xuan Liu. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER re 128 MOTION for Sanctions against Safety Trucking Defendants and their Attorney of Record filed by Pei Xiong Lin, Kuang Xuan Liu. Status Report due by 5/16/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/9/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding Plaintiffs and Safety Trucking's 171 4/24/16 Discovery Letter Brief re: Original Time Reports. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiffs' 163 Motion for Sanctions against the Win Woo Defendants. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER discharging 134 2/18/16 Order to Show Cause to Leon Jew. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/31/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Plaintiffs' 157 Motion to Compel.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Plaintiffs' 111 Motion to Continue Trial. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 92 First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena Duce Tecum filed by Jia Tun Zheng, Safety Trucking, LLC; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Leon Jew should not be sanctioned sua sponte under Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for filing the motion to quash. Show Cause Response due by 3/4/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/18/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 106 , 101 , 98 Discovery Letter Briefs re: Requests for Production of Documents, filed by Plaintiffs and Safety Trucking. Safety Trucking shall provide supplemental responses by 3/4/2016, and furnish Jiatun Zheng's sworn declaration by 3/4/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 107 , 99 Discovery Letter Brief re: Requests for Admission. Safety Trucking is ordered to serve supplemental responses by 2/19/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to file a supplemental declaration in opposition to 92 First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena Duce Tecum filed by Jia Tun Zheng, Safety Trucking, LLC. The declaration shall be filed by 2/12/16. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/9/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re Unusable Chambers Copies of 92 First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena Duce Tecum filed by Jia Tun Zheng, Safety Trucking, LLC. Submit a usable copy by 1/22/2016 at 12 noon. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/20/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Continue the Trial Date (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding Plaintiffs and Win Woo Trading, LLC's 76 8/31/2015 Discovery Letter Brief. Supplemental responses are due within 14 days. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Plaintiff and Safety Trucking's 73 , 74 , 75 Joint Discovery Letter Briefs. Defendant to serve supplemental responses within 14 days, absent court order or stipulation by the parties. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding Plaintiffs and Defendant Win Woo Trading's 72 Discovery Letter Brief. Defendant shall serve supplemental interrogatory responses within 14 days of this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Defendant Safety Trucking. Show Cause Response due by 8/17/2015. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/8/2015 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/5/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The parties shall submit a supporting declaration within 7 days of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/27/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Discharging 46 Order to Show Cause to Defendants Win Woo Trading, LLC, Safety Trucking, LLC, Jia Jing Zheng, Jia Tun Zheng, and Mindy Fang. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/15/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to all Defendants why they should not pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $500 each for failure to appear at the 12/16/2014 case management conference. Show Cause Response due by 1/9/2015.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/18/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Strike ; terminating 39 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendants shall file a second amended answer on or before January 9, 2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge James filed by Jia Tun Zheng, Safety Trucking, LLC, Pei Xiong Lin, Kuang Xuan Liu, Mindy Fang, Jia Jing Zheng, Win Woo Trading, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/4/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 24 Motion to Strike 24 MOTION to Strike 9 Answer to Amended Complaint. Defendants have 14 days to file an amended answer. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Pei Xiong Lin, Kuang Xuan Liu and Safety Trucking, LLC filed by Pei Xiong Lin, Kuang Xuan Liu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/27/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu et al v. Win Woo Trading, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuang Xuan Liu
Represented By: Xiaoyong X L Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pei Xiong Lin
Represented By: Xiaoyong X L Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Win Woo Trading, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jia Jing Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jia Tun Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindy Fang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?