JENKINS et al v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al

Plaintiff: Martin Jenkins, Johnathan Moore, Kevin Perry and William Tyndall
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association, Atlantic Coast Conference, Big 12 Conference, BIG TEN CONFERENCE, Pac-12 Conference and Southeastern Conference
Case Number: 4:2014cv02758
Filed: June 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/25/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/30/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Claudia Wilken. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 2:30 pm. Bench Trial (10 days) set for 12/3/2018 at 8:30 am.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Hon. Claudia Wilken denying 201 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING DAVID GREENSPAN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/28/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE. Fact Discovery due by 12/16/2016. Merits Expert Reports due by 2/10/2017. Rebuttal Merits Expert Reports due by 4/7/2017. Expert Discovery due by 5/5/2017. Plaintiffs' Dispositive Motion due by 6/30/2017. De fendants' Opposition to Dispositive Motion and Cross-Motion due by 7/28/2017. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Dispositive Motion and Opposition to Cross-Motion filed by 8/18/2017. Defendants' Reply in Support of Cross-Motion filed by 9/1/2017. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2017 02:30 PM. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for 9/19/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/24/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER GRANTING (196 in 4:14-cv-02758-CW) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Jennifer M. Stewart AND (371 in 4:14-md-02541-CW) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Jennifer M. Stewart ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10452902.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/16/16. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/17/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (195 in 4:14-cv-02758-CW) Status Report, (369 in 4:14-md-02541-CW) Status Report. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/16/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING. Motion to Intervene of ESPN, Inc., ESPN Enterprises, Inc., and American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.(158 in 4:14-cv-02758-CW, 314 in 4:14-md-02541 CW) set for 2/17/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to J. Wesley Earnhardt. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/11/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RULE 23(b)(3) MOTION, DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY, EXPERT DISCOVERY AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS re 301 Joint Submission on Proposed Briefing Schedules. Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2016. Expert Discovery due by 11 /15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2017. Responses due by 2/15/2017. Replies due by 3/8/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/27/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ON THE INJUNCTIVE RELIEF CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 05/29/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion for Injunctive Relief Class Certification and Case Management Conference re (125 in 4:14-cv-02758-CW) (211 in 4:14-md-02541-CW). Set/Reset Deadlines as to (105 in 4:14-cv-02758-CW) (163 in 4:14-md-02541-CW) Joint MOTION to Certify Class Consolidated Plaintiffs' and Jenkins Plaintffs', (117 in 4:14-cv-02758-CW) (200 in 4:14-md-02541-CW) Amended Joint Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing reset for 7/23 /2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/09/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPUALTED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (Re: dkt no. 121 in case no. 14-cv-2758-CW and dkt no. 207 in case no. 14-md-2541-CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/6/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (188 in case 4:14-md-02541-CW and 112 in case 4:14-cv-02758-CW) Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Documents and Materials. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (186) in case 4:14-md-02541-CW; (110) in case 4:14-cv-02758-CW STIPULATION REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM CERTAIN OTHER CASES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (180) in case 4:14-md-02541-CW; and (108) in case 4:14-cv-02758-CW Stipulation Resetting Schedule For Class Certification And Cancelling Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. (Set Deadlines: Motions due by 11/6/2014; Responses due by 1/15/2015; Replies due by 2/5/2015.) Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/5/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING 86 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/10/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice For Derek J. Sarafa. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS et al v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Jenkins
Represented By: Melissa Steedle Bogad
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Joseph A. Litman
Represented By: Timothy M, Nevius
Represented By: Ian L Papendick
Represented By: James S. Richter
Represented By: Sean Gerald Wieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Moore
Represented By: Melissa Steedle Bogad
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Joseph A. Litman
Represented By: Timothy M, Nevius
Represented By: Ian L Papendick
Represented By: James S. Richter
Represented By: Sean Gerald Wieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Perry
Represented By: Melissa Steedle Bogad
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Joseph A. Litman
Represented By: Timothy M, Nevius
Represented By: Ian L Papendick
Represented By: James S. Richter
Represented By: Sean Gerald Wieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tyndall
Represented By: Melissa Steedle Bogad
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Joseph A. Litman
Represented By: Timothy M, Nevius
Represented By: Ian L Papendick
Represented By: James S. Richter
Represented By: Sean Gerald Wieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH DREYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Coast Conference
Represented By: Sean C. Sheely
Represented By: Duvol M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big 12 Conference
Represented By: Matthew P. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG TEN CONFERENCE
Represented By: Michael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pac-12 Conference
Represented By: Wanda L. Ellert
Represented By: Joseph C. O'Keefe
Represented By: Lawrence R. Sandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Conference
Represented By: John A. Boyle
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: Robert Rory Moore
Represented By: Mark Jeremy Seifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?