Cutting Edge Solutions, LLC v. Sustainable Low Maintenance Grass, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cutting Edge Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Sustainable Low Maintenance Grass, LLC and Turf and Landscape Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv02770
Filed: June 16, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/15/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 25, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO CHANGE TIME re 20 and 23 Motions for Extension of Time. The hearing on the Motion to Stay will be held on August 20, 2014. CES has already filed its opposition to that motion. SLMG's reply is due July 29, 2014. The hear ing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be held on September 17, 2014. SLMG's opposition is due August 27, 2014. CES's reply is due September 3, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/25/2014. SLMG's answer or other response to the Complaint is due September 10, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
August 20, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 17 Motion to Stay. 13 Motion for a preliminary injunction is reset for argument on October 15, 2014; opposition is due September 17, 2014; reply is due October 1, 2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 13 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 24, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
February 20, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 69 Status Report filed by Cutting Edge Solutions, LLC. Further progress report re: settlement document due 3/13/15. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/20/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutting Edge Solutions, LLC v. Sustainable Low Maintenance Grass, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cutting Edge Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Laura L. Chapman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michelle D. Kahn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Molly Newland Tullman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sustainable Low Maintenance Grass, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Berman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roey Rahmil(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert E. Schaberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turf and Landscape Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Berman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roey Rahmil(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert E. Schaberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.