Henderson v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Alzata Elaine Henderson
Case Number: 4:2014cv02779
Filed: June 16, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 29, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 8/4/16 hearing; ORDER requiring the Commissioner to file a surreply in response to additional 7.0 hours sought in Plaintiff's 29 Reply filed by Alzata Elaine Henderson. Surreply due by 8/5/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/29/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
March 22, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment and remanding the case for further administrative proceeding consistent with this order.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
December 15, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Stipulation for extension of time for Plaintiff Alzata Elaine Henderson to file a motion for summary judgment or a motion to remand. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/15/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alzata Elaine Henderson
Represented By: Steven Matthew Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?