Mabutas v. Colley et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr.
Defendant: James Colley, Antioch Police Dept and City of Antioch
Case Number: 4:2014cv03796
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE re 54 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr., James Colley, Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/13/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr., James Colley, Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch. Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/1/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr., James Colley, Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2017 01:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/30/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr., James Colley, Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/1/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr., James Colley, Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2016. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/3/16. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order 39 REVISED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REVISED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr., James Colley, Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/17/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/01/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order 34 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PERMISSION TO DEPOSE PLAINTIFF AT CONTRA COSTA COUNTY JAIL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/29/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Lift Stay of Proceedings and Set CMC. Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2015 at 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2015. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/06/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch, James Colley filed by Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr., James Colley, Antioch Police Dept, City of Antioch, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/28/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabutas v. Colley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Antioch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Michael Mabutas, Jr.
Represented By: Mark William Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?