Macdonald et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Plaintiff: Bret Macdonald and Amalia Macdonald
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Case Number: 4:2014cv04970
Filed: November 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 90 Stipulation to Extend Pretrial Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 85 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Pretrial Documents. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 63 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 70 Stipulation to Continue Expert Discovery Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Stipulation for Extension of Expert Discovery Cut-Off. Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/27/2017.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 58 Stipulation Continuing Expert Discovery Deadlines: Initial Expert Disclosures Due by 12/9/2016; Initial Expert Disclosures Due by 12/23/2016; Expert Discovery Cut off by 1/6/2017.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 10/28/2016; Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. ( 49 STIPULATION To Continue Trial and Trial Related Deadlines DENIED as moot.) Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/21/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/12/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 43 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/6/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation to Set Case Management Conference.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 8 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/22/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macdonald et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Macdonald
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Adelaars
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalia Macdonald
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Adelaars
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?